HI SB2346 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the effective period of a protective order, temporary restraining order, or injunction restraining any party from contacting, threatening, or physically abusing a minor may extend to a date after the minor has reached 18 years of age.
Title
Relating To Temporary Restraining Orders, Protective Orders, And Injunctions.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 214). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3161) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2368) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-20 2:55PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2050 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).