HI SB2408 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands definition of "habitual operator of a vehicle while under the influence of an intoxicant" to include violators with at least one conviction within the last ten years for offense of habitually operating a vehicle while under the influence of an intoxicant.
Title
Motor Vehicles; Habitually Operating a Vehicle While Under the Influence of an Intoxicant
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 180). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2593) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1574 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2408&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2408_.HTM |