HI HB1574 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands definition of "habitual operator of a vehicle while under the influence of an intoxicant" to include violators with at least one conviction within the last ten years for offense of habitually operating a vehicle while under the influence of an intoxicant.
Title
Motor Vehicles; Habitually Operating a Vehicle While Under the Influence of an Intoxicant
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-09 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2408 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 28
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1574&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1574_.HTM |