HI SB2428 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public retiree contributions to the EUTF to be paid through withholdings of retirement benefit amounts from the ERS. (SB2428 HD1)
Title
ERS; EUTF; Retiree Copayments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6). |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1158-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-18 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2016-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-18-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 165) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2801) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-16 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:15PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2116) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2016 (Same As) 2016-07-11 - Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1335).