HI SB2568 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a production from qualifying for the motion picture, digital media, and film production tax credit if the production hires or monetarily compensates an employee of the State of Hawaii film office, employee of a county film commission, or company of which an employee of the State of Hawaii film office or a county film commission is a stakeholder. Requires a taxpayer claiming the tax credit to identify any such employee or company in its statement to the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Motion Picture, Digital Media, And Film Production.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2017) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1495 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Motion Picture, Digital Media, and Film Production Tax Credit
Qualified Production
State or County Employee
Qualified Production
State or County Employee