HI SB2581 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes provisions allowing for consumers to request data brokers that maintain their personal information to delete any personal information related to the consumer.
Title
Relating To Privacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1668 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2581&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2581_.HTM |