HI SB2588 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the charter school administrative office to withhold funds for its operational expenses, including salaries for staff and the executive director. The total amount of withheld funds shall be determined by the review panel and shall not exceed two per cent of the total charter school general fund appropriation.
Title
Charter School Administrative Office; Operational Expenses Withholding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2320) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Tsutsui, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deferred the measure until 02-10-10 1:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-10 1:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |