HI SB2588 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the offense of unsworn falsification to a law enforcement officer and a penalty of not less than a misdemeanor. (SD1)
Title
Penal Code; Unsworn Falsification to a Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2269) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |