HI SB2588 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides special education teachers with additional preparation time and funds for instructional materials. Makes appropriation.
Title
Department of Education; Special Education; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2537 (Same As) 2016-02-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 5
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2588&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2588_.HTM |