HI SB2588 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits psychologists to claim exemption from service as a juror if the case involves a psychologist or former patient. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Jurors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2604) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-20 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1614 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Referred to JDC.