HI SB2666 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies Goal 5 of the United Nations' 2030 Agenda for Sustainable Development to achieve gender equality and empower all women and girls. (SB2666 HD1)
Title
Relating To Sustainable Development Goals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1359-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, C. Lee, McDermott. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 260) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2775) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2128) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |