HI SB2811 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Act 213, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Act 213, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that parental rights may be terminated if the court determines, by clear and convincing evidence, that the child was conceived as a result of a sexual assault. Creates a presumption that termination of parental rights is in the best interest of the child if the child was conceived as a result of the sexual assault. (SB2811 HD1)
Title
Involuntary Termination of Parental Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | Senate | Act 213, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315). |
2016-07-08 | House | Act 213, on 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-04-25 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 690). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-25-16. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-25-16. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) McDermott replaced Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers have scheduled a decision making to agree to the House amendments on 04-21-16 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; L. Thielen. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 571). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1675-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-31 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2016-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-31-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6). |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1148-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-03-17 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-17-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 260) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2538) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 9:01AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2052) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-02-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDL. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2282 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).