HI SB2836 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum allowable generating capacity of an eligible customer-generator from 50 kilowatts to 100 kilowatts. Increases the total allowable rated generating capacity produced by eligible customer-generators from 0.5% to 3% of a utility's peak demand or 15% of peak circuit demand for all distribution-level circuits of 12kV or lower.
Title
Net Energy Metering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 3:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) Referred to ENE, CPN. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2836&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2836_.HTM |