HI SB2851 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Act 006, on 04/11/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Act 006, on 04/11/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Insurance Commissioner to determine whether residential property insurance is unavailable due to a moratorium on insurance policies in a lava zone during a state of emergency due to lava flow. (SD1)
Title
Property Insurance; Hawaii Property Insurance Association; Lava Zone; State of Emergency; Moratorium; Determination of Availability of Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Act 006, on 04/11/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106). |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Act 006, 04/11/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106). |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 376). |
2016-03-30 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Oshiro, Saiki, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-29 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1444-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Yamane. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-16 2:00PM. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 274) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2500) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH/PSM, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2322 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Referred to CPC, referral sheet 4