HI SB2867 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Temporarily transfers certain lands in West Maui to the Department of Accounting and General Services.
Title
Relating To The Transfer Of Land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/GVO, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2867&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2867_.HTM |