HI SB2990 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Act 109, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Act 109, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the legislative reference bureau to conduct a sunrise analysis of the impacts of and best framework for the establishment of paid family leave. Requires a report and proposed legislation be submitted to the legislature by 9/1/2019. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Family Leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-06 | Senate | Act 109, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210). |
2018-07-06 | House | Act 109, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Say, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 145-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 145-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Luke; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Keith-Agaran, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 10:30AM in Conference Room 329. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Keith-Agaran, English Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 605). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Har, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1988-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Kobayashi, Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1503-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-20-18 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 382) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2913) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 10:45AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2509) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to LBR, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2598 (Same As) 2018-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.