HI SB2991 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Re-Referred to HRE/JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Re-Referred to HRE/JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to article X, section 6, of the Hawaii State Constitution to modify the appointment process for the Board of Regents of the University of Hawaii. Repeals the requirement that the Governor can only appoint from pools of candidates presented by the Candidate Advisory Council for the Board of Regents of the University of Hawaii.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article X, Section 6, Of The Hawaii State Constitution, To Modify The Appointment Process For The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE/JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 9:40AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE/JDC, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2991&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2991_.HTM |