HI SB302 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and the appropriation of funds for deposit into the rental housing trust fund to finance affordable rental housing development. (SD1)
Title
General Obligation Bonds; Appropriation; Rental Housing Trust Fund ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 33) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2013-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 01-28-13 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 01-26-13 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB521 (Same As) 2013-03-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.