HI SB302 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates immunity for individuals who prescribe, possess, or administer an opioid antagonist such as naloxone hydrochloride during an opioid-related drug overdose. Authorizes emergency personnel to administer naloxone hydrochloride. Requires medicaid coverage for naloxone hydrochloride. Exempts pharmacists and pharmacies from licensure and permitting requirements, except for drug storage requirements, for storing and distributing opioid antagonists. Makes an appropriation for drug overdose recognition, prevention, and response, including the distribution and administration of naloxone hydrochloride. (SD1)
Title
Opioid Antagonist; Naloxone Hydrochloride; Drug Overdose; Prevention; Emergency Response; Medical Immunity; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 381) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-13-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-15 1:40PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HTH/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |