HI SB3031 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - (S) Act 088, 4/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - (S) Act 088, 4/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 281-78(b), HRS, to clarify that a licensee who timely suppresses unlawful activity, including by means of detaining and reporting an offender to the police, occurring on the licensed premises shall not be in violation of that section. (SB3031 HD1)
Title
Intoxicating Liquor; Liquor Licensee; Liability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | (S) Act 088, 4/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Act 088, on 4/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 746). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Kahele. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) One Day Notice 04-13-12. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-13-12. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Deferred until 04-12-12. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 384). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-05-12. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1499-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Keith-Agaran, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Ching. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-29-12 2:35PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1263-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Pine. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 03-22-12 9:15AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to ERB, CPC, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 400) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2575) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-27-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2265) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 3:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to PGM, JDL. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |