HI SB3031 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the director of finance to issue general obligation bonds to finance capital improvements to various irrigation systems. (SD1)
Title
Irrigation; General Obligation Bonds; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2355) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Wakai, Slom. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |