HI SB3158 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that lease extensions approved by the Board of Land and Natural Resources be drafted on forms that reflect contemporary leasing practices and policies of the Board, and which shall control over conflicting or inconsistent provisions in the lease being extended. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Updating Public Land Leases Issued Pursuant To Chapter 171, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2321) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 1:10PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2469 (Same As) 2024-02-01 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.