HI SB3285 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the Public Utilities Commission from approving the sale of a gas utility, or electric utility, in whole or in part, to a private entity, unless the utility being offered for sale demonstrates that it solicited competitive offers from an entity operating under a non-investor-owned utilities ownership model, and notes whether or not non-investor-owned entities submitted acceptable bids, in any application to the PUC requesting authorization for a sale of the utility. Authorizes the PUC to establish a procedure for consideration of alternative bids if there is a sale of a gas or electric utility. Specifies that the appointment of a receiver for a distressed utility applies to all public utilities. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Public Utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5). |
2024-03-15 | House | Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1151-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-03-14 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Souza. |
2024-03-14 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 03-14-24 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 317) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2756) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-24 9:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2615 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Alternative Bids
Approval
Electric Utility
Gas Utility
Non-Investor-Owned Utilities
Public Utility Receiver
PUC
Sale
Approval
Electric Utility
Gas Utility
Non-Investor-Owned Utilities
Public Utility Receiver
PUC
Sale