HI SB374 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB374
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an add-on payment of forty per cent to the medicaid base rate for medicaid enrollees at long-term care facilities that have medically complex conditions requiring higher level of care. Appropriates funds for fiscal years 2018 and 2019 to cover increased costs. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Medicaid.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 32) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-27-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB374 (Carry Over) 2017-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB93 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
HB93 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).