HI SB407 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB407
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds as a subsidy to the office of the prosecuting attorney for Hawaii county for the career criminal prosecution unit.
Title
Making An Appropriation To The Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney For Hawaii County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 401) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 10:05AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB407 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Career Criminal Prosecution Unit
Office of the Prosecuting Attorney for Hawaii County
Subsidy
Career Criminal Prosecution Unit
Office of the Prosecuting Attorney for Hawaii County
Subsidy
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=407&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB407_.HTM |