HI SB455 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii public housing authority to designate no more than fifty per cent of the units in public housing projects as smoking units; requires designation of smoking areas; prohibits smoking in and around public housing projects except in smoking units and designated smoking areas; establishes penalties. (SD1)
Title
Public Housing; Smoking Prohibited
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Hooser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to HSG/HLT, JUD, referral sheet 28 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 165) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 513) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-09 1:35 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDH. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |