HI SB455 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB455
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Certification of Emergency Medical Technicians (EMTs) to include personnel with proper certifications, to be deemed qualified to perform emergency medical services as EMTs in the State.
Title
Relating To Emergency Medical Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, CPN. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/HTH, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPN. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB214 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB455 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Re-Referred to PSM, CPN.
SB455 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Re-Referred to PSM, CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=455&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB455_.HTM |