HI SB514 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB514
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 13
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 13
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax credit to taxpayers and makes deposits to the emergency and budget reserve fund and other post-employment benefits trust fund pursuant to article VII, section 6, of the Hawaii Constitution. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The General Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 13 |
2021-02-16 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 13) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-12-21. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 57) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB514 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 13
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Constitution
Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund
Mandatory Tax Credit
Other Post-Employment Benefits Trust Fund
Constitution
Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund
Mandatory Tax Credit
Other Post-Employment Benefits Trust Fund