HI SB514 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB514
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - Act 115, on 06/22/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - Act 115, on 06/22/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax refund to the taxpayers of the State and makes deposits to the emergency and budget reserve fund and pension accumulation fund pursuant to article VII, section 6, of the Hawaii State Constitution. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The General Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | Act 115, on 06/22/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215). |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Act 115, 06/22/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-09 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 959). |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2022-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-05-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday 05-05-22. |
2022-05-03 | House | Floor amendment adopted as amended CD 2 with none voting no and none excused. |
2022-05-03 | House | Floor Amendment No. 8 offered by Rep. Luke. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 05-05-22. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Report filed. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 13 offered. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 236-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 236-22). |
2022-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-29-22 1:35PM; Conference Room 309. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke, Yamashita Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 875). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 580). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-12 | House | Floor amendment failed with Noes, 1 (Representative(s) Luke). Excused, 0 (none). |
2022-04-12 | House | Floor Amendment No. 2 offered by Rep. Ward. |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan excused (2). |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1843-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:35PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-05-22. |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 13 |
2021-02-16 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 13) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-12-21. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 57) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB514 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 13
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Constitution
Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund
Mandatory Tax Refund
Pension Accumulation Fund
Constitution
Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund
Mandatory Tax Refund
Pension Accumulation Fund