HI SB562 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and makes an appropriation to the department of public safety for the establishment and implementation of a re-entry facility for criminal offenders, which will include residential and day reporting programs.
Title
Recidivism; Criminal Offenders; Re-Entry Facility; General Obligation Bonds; Appropriation; Department of Public Safety ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 51) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB368 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=562&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB562_.HTM |