HI SB575 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET/CPH/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET/CPH/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning on January 1, 2016, prohibits the sale of personal care products that contain synthetic plastic microbeads, excluding personal care products that contain synthetic plastic microbeads that are less than one part per million by weight, natural exfoliants, and personal care products that contain only biodegradable synthetic plastic microbeads. Establishes the plastic pollution special fund and requires violators to pay a fine that is deposited into the general fund and the plastic pollution special fund.
Title
Environment; Environmental Protection; Health; Synthetic Plastic Microbeads; Prohibition; Personal Care Products; Plastic Pollution Special Fund; General Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/CPH/JDL, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to ENE/HTH, JDL/WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=575&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB575_.HTM |