HI SB575 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB575
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the position of state coordinator on homelessness and requires the state coordinator on homelessness to report directly to the lieutenant governor. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To The State Coordinator On Homelessness.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB575 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
HB374 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB374 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=575&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB575_.HTM |