HI SB581 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB581
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the cap on the amount of conveyance taxes that may be paid into the rental housing revolving fund and increases the percentage of conveyance taxes collected that shall be paid into the rental housing revolving fund.
Title
Relating To The Conveyance Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 28) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB581 (Carry Over) 2017-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=581&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB581_.HTM |