HI SB721 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the authority of the Hawaii Community Development Authority to assess the costs of providing public facilities against real property in the community development district from mandatory to discretionary. Takes effect July 1, 2020. (SB721 HD1)
Title
District-Wide Improvement Programs; Assessments
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-05-01 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 4:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-05-01 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 2:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 10:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-09 4:30pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-09 10:30 AM in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-09 3:30 PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-09 2:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-22 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-09 2:30pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-21 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 719). | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Bunda, Fukunaga, Hemmings. | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Ito, Har Co-Chairs; Ching. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 480). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Mizuno, Morita, Sagum, Takai, Ward excused (7). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-14-2009. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1717) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Sagum, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishimoto, Wooley. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-09 4:30pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1160), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, C. Lee, Luke, Sagum, Ching; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morita; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Thielen. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 03-20-09 10:00 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 26 | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 62). | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Hemmings). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) One Day Notice 03-06-09. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 482) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Fukunaga, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Bunda, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-09 3:30 PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to WTL. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB773 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.