HI SB748 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to school complex areas for academic coaches, professional development, and teacher retention.
Title
DOE; Complex Areas; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 128) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-09 2:30 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |