HI SB749 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-24 - Re-Referred to WTL/EGH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-24 - Re-Referred to WTL/EGH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes references from the public land development corporation to the public private partnership corporation. Adds two non-voting members to the board of directors. Amends the process and requirements for the development and implementation of development plans. Revises the corporation's investment and financing authority. Requires the corporation to comply with chapters 6E, 92, 104, 343, and 444, HRS; sections 10-3.5 and 171-64.7, HRS; and native Hawaiian gathering rights. Requires coordination with the Hawaii Community Development Authority and the Land Use Commission where appropriate. Revises the corporation's reporting requirements. Requires the Public Land Development Corporation to initiate a pilot project after the adoption of rules. Prohibits the Public Land Development Corporation from planning, developing or implementing any projects other than the pilot project until the pilot project has been completed. Requires the Public Land Development Corporation to include a report on the status of the pilot project in its annual report and requires the Public Land Development Corporation to provide a report to the governor and legislature evaluating the pilot project upon its completion. Pilot project repeals on 1/1/16.
Title
Public Land Development Corporation; Public-Private Partnership Corporation; Public Lands; Development Plans and Projects; Investments; Financing; Land Use Commission; Hawaii Community Development Authority; Land Use; Historic Preservation; Ceded Land; Pilot Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1134 (Same As) 2013-02-11 - The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=749&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB749_.HTM |