HI SB749 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB749
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires twenty per cent of the department of human services' annual medicaid budget to be used for housing-related services and other permanent supportive services for homeless individuals with mental illness or substance use disorders. Requires the department to seek a section 1115 waiver from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services.
Title
Relating To Human Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 36) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-17 2:55PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HOU, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB749 (Carry Over) 2017-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=749&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB749_.HTM |