HI SB805 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination in real property transactions based on lawful source of income.
Title
Discrimination in Real Property Transactions; Source of Income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB676 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Referred to CPN/EGH, JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=805&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB805_.HTM |