HI SB805 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the sunset provision from Act 255, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, relating to the definitions of "the practice of nursing as a licensed practical nurse" and "the practice of nursing as a registered nurse".
Title
Nursing; Practical Nurse; Registered Nurse
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1017), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2015-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-20-15 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 34). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 582) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-25-15 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 66) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 1:15PM in conference room CR414. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=805&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB805_.HTM |