HI SB808 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 217, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 217, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the school facilities agency as the school facilities authority. Describes the powers and responsibilities of the school facilities authority by amending chapter 302A, part VI, subpart C and Act 72, Session Laws of Hawaii 2020. Transfers the total fund balance in the state educational improvement fund to the school facilities special fund by an unspecified date. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The School Facilities Agency.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Act 217, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1345). |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Act 217, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1345). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Excused, 0 (none). |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 148) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 148). |
2021-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Cullen, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 4:05PM; CR 309. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 577). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-21 4:15PM; CR 309. |
2021-04-19 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Cullen added as Co-Chair. Representative Luke discharged as Co-Chair. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Luke Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Okimoto. |
2021-04-16 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Keith-Agaran added as Co-Chair. Senator Kanuha discharged as Co-Chair. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha, Rhoads Co-Chairs. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 469). |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1808), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Perruso. |
2021-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1351) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Yamane. |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-18-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 & 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 282) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 969) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 10:35AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 200) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |