HI SB816 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB816
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to resolve the compensation differential for certain union members for the modified terms, conditions, and compensation practices caused by the transfer of the use and exclusive management and operations of Maui Memorial Medical Center, Kula Hospital, and Lanai Community Hospital from the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation to Maui Health System. (SB816 HD2)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Legislative Management: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1567) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Tuesday, 03-19-19 3:00PM in House conference room 312. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from LAB/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1363) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/HLT on Thursday, 03-14-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-12 | House | Re-referred to LAB/HLT, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB/HLT, CPC, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 260) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1195) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 113) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB816 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).