HI SB820 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of public school student representatives on the board of education from one to two.
Title
Board of Education; Student Representatives; Public Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=820&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB820_.HTM |