HI SB845 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - The committee on HSH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - The committee on HSH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain state entities and grantees to adopt bullying prevention policies. Establishes a task force to assist the Governor with bullying prevention policies in the State.
Title
Bullying; Safe Schools for All Students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee on HSH deferred the measure. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-05-15 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 1:30PM in conference room CR229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HSH, JDL/WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB819 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 4:15PM in conference room 329.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=845&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB845_.HTM |