HI SB865 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 173, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 173, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits persons licensed as an electrical or plumbing contractor under this chapter to enter into contracts to perform electrical or plumbing work; provided that if a contractor's responsible managing employee, which includes a sole proprietor, is not licensed in accordance with chapter 448E, HRS, then the contractor shall employ individuals licensed in accordance with chapter 448E, HRS, to actually perform the electrical or plumbing work. Exempts employees of public utilities and community antennae television companies. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 173, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 173, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 44) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 44). |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Nishihara. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi Chair; Fukumoto, Ward. |
2017-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 514). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 401). |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Har, McKelvey, Oshiro, Say excused (5). |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1559) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Yamane, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-29 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 280) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 564) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB976 (Same As) 2017-02-02 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1).