HI SB913 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Act 016, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Act 016, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of public safety to collect data relating to the number of incoming offenders into the state correctional system who are parents, the number of children they have that are under the age of eighteen, and any other information that the department of public safety deems useful to facilitate services to incarcerated parents or their children. (SD1)
Title
Public Safety; Incarcerated Parent Data
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Act 016, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Act 016, 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116). |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 358). |
2015-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1380), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-31 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2015-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-31-15 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2). |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1074), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Tupola. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-19-15 10:05AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 239) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from HSH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 595) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-15 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HSH/PSM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB998 (Same As) 2015-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).