HI SB913 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB913
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to HRE/LCA, CPH.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to HRE/LCA, CPH.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force within the University of Hawaii to assess the advisability and feasibility of transitioning Hilo medical center into a John A. Burns school of medicine teaching hospital and requires a report to be submitted to the legislature. Dissolves the task force on June 30, 2020.
Title
Relating To The John A. Burns School Of Medicine.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE/LCA, CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HRE/LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB913 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to HRE/LCA, CPH.
HB1047 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1047 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=913&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB913_.HTM |