HI SB937 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Develops the Hawaii Food Resiliency Initiative. Establishes the Hawaii Food Resiliency Task Force. Appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB937 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Food Resiliency Initiative; Hawaii Food Resiliency Task Force; Department of Agriculture; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2). |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1063) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 03-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 250) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 820) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 284) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |