HI SB937 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB937
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the state public charter school commission to allocate to charter schools for meal service costs. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 173) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB730 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB937 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB937 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.