HI SB944 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits open intoxicating liquor containers on any common area of a public housing project.
Title
Intoxicating Liquor; Public Housing; Prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDL. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB83 (Same As) 2013-01-22 - Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 2