HI SB944 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB944
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Re-Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Re-Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Department of Budget and Finance for collective bargaining cost items related to the transition of affected Maui region hospital employees to employment with Maui Health System, a Kaiser Foundation Hospitals LLC. (SB944 HD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation For Collective Bargaining Cost Items Related To The Transition Of Maui Region Hospitals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Holt, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 535). |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1724), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola, Ward. |
2017-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-04-17 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-04-17. |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17. |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1186) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-16 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-16-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 60) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 590) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-17 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 300) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 8:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB944 (Carry Over) 2017-04-18 - Re-Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM.
HB1078 (Same As) 2017-02-23 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1078 (Same As) 2017-02-23 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.